Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Judith Van Amburgh, Wayne Van Amburgh, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Merrill, Sara Jean, against Amchem Products, Inc., N K A Rhone Poulenc Ag Company, N K A Bayer Cropscience Inc.,, Carrier Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps Llc, Grinnell Llc, (total of 16) See All represented by Bui, Thuy T, Burbridge, John Joseph, Gasior, Joan M., Goodearl, David James, Hersh, Ryan David, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Erin P Gall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErin P Gall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Rensselaer. The plaintiffs, Wayne Van Amburgh and Judith Van Amburgh, are residents and citizens of the State of New York. The defendants named in the complaint include...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 12, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 29, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 25, 2024ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: December 18, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 12, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 06, 2023SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: December 04, 2023SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: November 30, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: November 30, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 18, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 17, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint |
||
January 25, 2024 |
ANSWER Carrier Corporation |
||
December 27, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation |
||
December 18, 2023 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SCHEDULING ORDER |
||
December 12, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Warren Pumps LLC |
||
December 11, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Amchem Products, Inc. |
||
December 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 06, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Honeywell Inc. - Answer to Amended Complaint |
||
December 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 04, 2023 | SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.