Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Owner Trustee For Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2021-Gs1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nierer, Cynthia Anne, against Jane Does Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises, John Does, John H. Carlo Iii A K A John Carlo A K A John Carlo, Iii A K A John H. Carlo A K A John I. Carlo Iii A K A John I. Carlo, Samaritan Hospital, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Foreclosure Settlement Part presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure proceeding filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as the owner trustee for Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2021-GS1, against John H. Carlo III, also known as John Carlo and John I. Carlo, and Samaritan Hospital. Th...
Jane Does Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 09, 2024ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: October 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 03, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 03, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 27, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 27, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHELLE INOW SHA JANE DOE #1 |
||
November 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SAMARITAN HOSPITAL |
||
November 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303 MAILING |
||
November 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN H. CARLO III A/K/A JOHN CARLO 3215 MAILING |
||
November 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHELLE INOW SHA JANE DOE #1 1303 MAILING |
||
November 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN H. CARLO III A/K/A JOHN CARLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.