Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Edwards, Joshua Ricardo, Risalvato, Anthony Joseph, against James R. Porter, Jennifer Porter A K A Jennifer Christman A K A Jennifer Redd-Porter, John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Technology Credit Union, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC against Jennifer Porter, James R. Porter, Technology Credit Union, and fictitious defendants. The plaintiff alleges that it is the owner and holder of the note and mortgag...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 04, 2024CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 04, 2024 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
January 04, 2024 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 04, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE - NO DOES |
||
November 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - TECHNOLOGY CREDIT UNION |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- JAMES R. PORTER |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 3215 Mailing- JAMES R. PORTER |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 3215 Mailing-JENNIFER PORTER A/K/A JENNIFER CHRISTMAN A/K/A JENNIFER REDD-PORTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.