Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Berkshire Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gipe, Cassandra Marie, against Herman J. Lockrow, Lockrow Contracting, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Adam W Silverman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Berkshire Bank against Lockrow Contracting, LLC and Herman J. Lockrow. The complaint states that Berkshire Bank is a banking corporation and Lockrow Contracting, LLC is a limited liability company. The comp...
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 22, 2024RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 09, 2024BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-H
Date: September 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Settlement Conference scheduled for February 9, 2024 @ 1:30 p.m. via Microsoft Teams |
||
January 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Lender Affidavit in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Granting Default Judgment et a Exhibit A to Lender Affidavit in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Granting Default Judgment et a ... show more |
||
January 09, 2024 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
January 09, 2024 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1) Bill of Costs |
||
January 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1-7 (Motion #1) Exhibits 1-7 to Attorney Affirmation in Support of Ex Parte Motion For Order Granting Default Judgme ... show more Exhibits 1-7 to Attorney Affirmation in Support of Ex Parte Motion For Order Granting Default Judgme ... show more Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 09, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Ex Parte Motion For Order Granting Default Judgment et al |
||
January 09, 2024 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Order Granting Default Judgment, Replevin and Awarding Attorney's Fees et al |
||
January 09, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Lender's Affidavit in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Granting Default Judgment and fees et al |
||
October 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing - Herman Lockrow |
||
October 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 Notice to Individual - Herman Lockrow |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.