Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pawnee Leasing Corporation,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Grossman, Morgan S., Jaslow, Howard M, Luchs, Morgan S., against And Joseph A Alberino Aka Joseph A Alberino Iii, Christopher Alberino Aka Christopher M Alberino Aka C M Alberino, The Cookie Factory Llc, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York by Pawnee Leasing Corporation against The Cookie Factory LLC, Christopher Alberino, and Joseph A. Alberino. Pawnee Leasing Corporation is seeking to recover the sum of $165,798.12...
AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 25, 2024ORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED)
Date: January 26, 2024JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | ORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED) | ||
January 25, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 25, 2024 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 19, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 15, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Demand |
||
September 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Payoff |
||
September 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.