Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
New Residential Mortgage Loan Trust 2017-6, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Messina, Patrick Gerard, Roach, Peter Tatian, against Allstate Insurance Company A S O June Gillie, Alpha Tree Service, George G Conrad A K A George Conrad, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint,, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Foreclosure Settlement Part presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by New Residential Mortgage Loan Trust 2017-6 against George G. Conrad, also known as George Conrad, and Allstate Insurance Company as the assignee of June Gillie and Alpha Tree Service. The complaint alle...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 22, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 24, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 09, 2024CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A NOTE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D LOAN MODIFICATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C ASSIGNMENTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B MTG Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
January 09, 2024 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JUNE GILLIE |
||
September 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - 1303 NOTICE TO TENANT |
||
September 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JOHN DOE #2 |
||
September 27, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
September 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NON - MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - GEORGE CONRAD |
||
September 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NON - MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - GEORGE C. CONRAD |
||
September 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - GEORGE C. CONRAD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.