Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Troy, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Bernstein, Jonathan Marc, against Troy Police Benevolent & Protective Association, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Henry F Zwack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry F Zwack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: February 09, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-PETITION
Date: December 02, 2021ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: December 08, 2021INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: February 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 09, 2022ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 14, 2021MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 08, 2021PETITION
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected* Notice of Appeal |
||
February 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service via electronic & US Mail |
||
February 09, 2022 |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Informational Sheet |
||
February 09, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Decision and Order | ||
February 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 31, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 08, 2021 |
ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Verified Answer to Cross-Petition |
||
December 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service |
||
December 08, 2021 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW Petitioner's Memo of Law in Further Support of Verified Petition to Stay Arbitration and in Oppositi Petitioner's Memo of Law in Further Support of Verified Petition to Stay Arbitration and in Oppositi ... show more |
||
December 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Affirmation in Reply and Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.