Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Petra Schaudt As Assignee Of Melissa A. Schaudt, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Farer, Steven David, against Aames Capital Corporation D B A Aames Home Loans, Rbmg, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15 Proceeding) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 21, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 26, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2021JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY | ||
July 26, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
July 26, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) | ||
July 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) C - Filed Affidavits of Service |
||
July 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Plaintiff Affidavit in Support |
||
July 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) B- Filed Notice of Pendency |
||
July 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) A-Filed Summons and Complaint |
||
June 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental Affidavit of Service on Aames Capital Corporation - Returned Mail |
||
June 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Follow up service on Aames Capital Corporation d/b/a Aames Home Loans |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.