Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelkonian, Hon. Michael H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management15 days |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2016 |
CategorySp-Cplr Article 78 (Body Or Officer) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Case Cycle Time151 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
May 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Melkonian (Court Activity) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
February 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Melkonian (Hearing) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Melkonian (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Melkonian (Hearing) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Melkonian (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.