Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County. This case was filed in Rensselaer County Superior Courts with McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryMat-Contested |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time14 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Mcgrath (Motion Part) Judge: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. |
|
September 20, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 09/27/2016Decided Before Justice: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. Answer demanded: No Judge: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. |
|
September 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Mcgrath (Motion Part) Judge: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Mcgrath (Court Activity) Judge: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Mcgrath (Motion Part) Judge: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. |
|
December 22, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 01/05/2016Decided Before Justice: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. Answer demanded: No Judge: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. |
|
December 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Mcgrath (Motion Part) Judge: McGrath, Hon. Patrick J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.