Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County. This case was filed in Rensselaer County Superior Courts with Henry F. Zwack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Melkonian (Trial Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Post-Settled Before Trial Melkonian (Court Activity) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
March 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Zwack (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Zwack, Hon. Henry F. |
|
January 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
November 23, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
November 02, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 01/13/2016Decided Before Justice: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. Answer demanded: No Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
November 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
August 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Melkonian (Motion Part) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.