Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, As Owner Trustee Of The Residential Credit Opportunities Trust V-C, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Friedman Vartolo, Llp, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against Aceny, Inc., Alpine Advance 5 Llc, John Doe And Jane Doe, Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Mohi U. Khandaker If Living, And If Dead, The Unknown Heirs And Distributees Of The Estate Of Mohi U. Khandaker, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as the owner trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust V-C, against Mohi U. Khandaker and other defendants. The objective of the action is to foreclose ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Affidavit of Due Diligence
Date: December 27, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 27, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 27, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: November 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Due Diligence Affidavit of Due Diligence Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
December 27, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Serve by Publication |
||
December 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) S&C, NOP, COM |
||
December 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
December 27, 2023 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
December 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
December 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AOS |
||
December 27, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Successive Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.