Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Claude Thomas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mangona, Anthony John, against County Of Nassau, John Doe, Transdev Services, Inc.,, represented by Ciaccio, Antonin A, Levasseur, Guy J, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Maurice E. Muir presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Claude Thomas, is suing Transdev Services, Inc. and the County of Nassau, along with a fictitious defendant named "John Doe," who...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 18, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Change Venue |
||
December 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
December 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer, Combined Demands and Demand to Change Venue |
||
December 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Court Decisions |
||
December 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
December 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 14, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 14, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.