Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jennifer Bocchino, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Koyfman, Regina, against Dollar Tree Inc., Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., represented by Levien, Bradley Jay, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Timothy J Dufficy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy J Dufficy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Jennifer Bocchino, is suing Dollar Tree Inc. and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. The complaint alleges that the defendants were negligent, careless, and...
NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: January 02, 2024DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: December 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 02, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 17, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 17, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice to HRA and NYS DOH pursuant to CPLR-306C |
||
January 02, 2024 | NOTICE TO ADMIT | ||
January 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Proof of Dollar tree, Inc.'s VA residency |
||
January 02, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Proof that Dollar Tree Inc. is inactive |
||
January 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Residency of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. |
||
January 02, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Dollar Tree, Inc.'s no-hit from NY Sec of State |
||
January 02, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.