Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Karolina W. Morales Lopez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Grogan, Teresa J., Dobrzanski, Agnieszka Magdalena, against Juan M. Morales Lopez, represented by Colmena, Roger, Nivin, Joseph Harris, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Danielle Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
April 11, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Sealed |
||
April 04, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 03, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 14, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 09, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
March 09, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
March 09, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
March 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.