Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
William A Cuenca Llivisaca, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Bota, Victor Ionut, against Peter Friend Motorcycles Llc D B A Empire Harley Davidson, represented by Boyce, James M., in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligent Services) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, William A. Cuenca Llivisaca, is suing the defendant, Peter Friend Motorcycles LLC, doing business as Empire Harley Davidson. The ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION (CPLR 306-C) (WITH PROOF OF SERVICE) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 31, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice To Take and Preserve Evidence directed to Plaintiff |
||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2024 |
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION (CPLR 306-C) (WITH PROOF OF SERVICE) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 11, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 14, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands [Various] Directed to Plaintiff |
||
December 14, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars directed to Plaintiff |
||
November 28, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer obo Def Peter Friend Motorcycles d/b/a Empire Harley Davidson |
||
November 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION EBT Notice to Plaintiff |
||
November 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PETER FRIEND MOTORCYCLES LLC D/B/A EMPIRE HARLEY DAVIDSON |
||
November 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.