Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Samantha Ashley Mccoy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kennedy, Colleen Marie, against Jin C. Huang, represented by Isserlis, Nancy L, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 18, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 12, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 15, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 15, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 23, 2022 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
February 18, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 18, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 23, 2021 | Answer and D & I Demands | ||
October 29, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Jin C Huang |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.