Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Spbmcc03 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Schwarz, Eric K, against Northwell Health, Inc., represented by Holubnyczyj, Lena, Papa, Laura M, Simone, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Frederick Sampson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Adult Survivors Act |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, identified as SPBMCCO3 DOE, is filing a complaint against Northwell Health, Inc. The complaint alleges that the plaintiff was a v...
DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: January 04, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 11, 2024 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
January 11, 2024 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
January 11, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS On Behalf of Northwell Health, Inc. |
||
January 11, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
January 04, 2024 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | ||
November 15, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
November 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Order to Show Cause, Affirmation in Support with Exhibits 1 &2, RJI Form and Affidavit of Service of Order to Show Cause, Affirmation in Support with Exhibits 1 &2, RJI Form and ... show more |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of E-Filing Form, Summons & Verified Complaint served on Northwell Health, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.