Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Da Long Huang, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wiese, Andrew Peter, against Corey Mowatt, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Kevin J Kerrigan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle - City |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Da Long Huang, is suing Corey Mowatt and The City of New York as defendants. The complaint alleges that on February 18, 2023, the defendant Corey...
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 27, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 27, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 27, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 27, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Corey Mowatt |
||
November 16, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
October 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- The City of New York |
||
October 09, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.