Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
In The Matter Of The Petition Of J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Transfer- Structured Sett) case represented by Chaikin, Ianiv Moshe, against Jared Campofiori, New York Life Insurance And Annuity Corporation, New York Life Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Transfer- Structured Sett) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
|
EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 04, 2022PETITION
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 04, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 04, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO OSC (AFTER SERVICE) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter with underlying settlement agreement |
||
December 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 01, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 30, 2022 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO OSC (AFTER SERVICE) (Motion #001) Letter with supporting documents |
||
November 30, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter with corrected disclosure statement |
||
October 11, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
October 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents |
||
October 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Prior Orders |
||
October 04, 2022 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.