Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Darren Confessore, Diane Schultz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Inniss, Larry, Licatesi, Anthony J., Moore, Darren Thomas, against Jorge M Pacheco, Sebastian Daniel Pacheco, represented by Giovinazzi, Robert Edward, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip Hom Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiffs, Darren Confessore and Diane Schultz, are suing the defendants, Sebastian Daniel Pacheco and Jorge M Pacheco. The complaint alleges that on Augus...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 15, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 14, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 15, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 15, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 08, 2024REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 14, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in Support |
||
January 22, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) *Corrected* Plaintiff's Notice of Motion |
||
January 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Answer with Counterclaims |
||
January 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
January 22, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts |
||
January 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Report of Motor Vehicle Accident |
||
January 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Reply to Counterclaims |
||
January 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Affidavit |
||
January 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Answer with Cross-Claims |
||
January 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Plaintiff Diane affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.