Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Connie Leung, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Della Mura, Peter, against Dora Ariyeva, Michael Gendin, The City Of New York, represented by Brownell, Richard, Cinquemani, Rita Maria, Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence - City (Premise: Sidewalk) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 11, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 25, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 05, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001) Exhibit G Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Notice for D&I to the city |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) CoD City's Answer |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Verified Answer |
||
August 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
August 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Complaint |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) PC Order |
||
June 02, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 16, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.