Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Revival Resources, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, Lynch, Patricia Rose, against Guaranty Association Benefits Company, Maxie James, Zurich American Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Robert Ian Caloras presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sale/Transfer) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
PETITION
Date: October 26, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 26, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 30, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Annuity/Verification
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 04, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2020PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: February 04, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 04, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry |
||
March 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 04, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 04, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Structured Settlement Annuity Sale and Assignment Agreement |
||
February 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit in Support |
||
February 04, 2021 | PETITION (AMENDED) | ||
February 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Disclosure Statement |
||
November 02, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.