Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Maria Luz Vicente, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bruno, Kyle Christopher, against Brenda J. Rodriguez Prutts, Metropolitan Transit Authority, Mta Bus Company, New York City Transit Authority, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 10, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 19, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 19, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 22, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 19, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 19, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 08, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 13, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 06, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 19, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 03, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 06, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Expert Witness Notice - Dr. Bender [Neuro IME] |
||
September 29, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
July 25, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demands |
||
June 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service |
||
June 22, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
May 16, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 08, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
January 07, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demand Letter |
||
September 03, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 19, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.