Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jacqueline Lopez Rojas v. Royal Sky Ltd., Abdellatif Jadir
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge Mojgan Lancman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 28, 2024
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Overview
Causes of Action
CAUSE OF ACTION IN FAVOR OF JACQUELINE LOPEZ ROJAS
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Queens County. The plaintiff, Jacqueline Lopez Rojas, is suing the defendants, Royal Sky Ltd. and Abdellatif Jadir, in a tort action. The plaintiff alleges that on or about M…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: Dec 19, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Dec 15, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 15, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Nov 15, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Nov 15, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: Nov 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: Oct 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 20, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
December 15, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 15, 2023 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
November 15, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 15, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 14, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Combined Demands |
||
October 27, 2023 | Answer and D&I Demands | ||
October 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROYAL SKY LTD. |
||
October 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ABDELLATIF JADIR |
||
September 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |