Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anna Kaye Boothe-Littlejohn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Park, Inho A., against American Unit Trans Inc., Md. Mahmud Imam, represented by Mulholland, Rory Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This is a complaint filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Anna Kaye Boothe-Littlejohn, is suing American Unit Trans Inc. and Md. Mahmud Imam for injuries sustained in a motor vehicle accident. The compl...
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 26, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 26, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 26, 2023 |
ANSWER Notice of Appearance, Verified Answer & Demands |
||
October 26, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MD. MAHMUD IMAM |
||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN UNIT TRANS INC. |
||
October 05, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.