Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Loretta Bruce v. Rochdale Village, Inc., Summit Property Management Services Inc., Marion Scott Real Estate, Inc.
A Torts - Other (Premises Liability) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 31, 2024
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Category
Torts - Other (premises liability)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Loretta Bruce, is suing Rochdale Village, Inc., Summit Property Management Services Inc., and Marion Scott Real Estate, Inc. …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 29, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Dec 29, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Dec 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: Dec 06, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: Dec 06, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Dec 06, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: Dec 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 22, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Nov 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 12, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 20, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 29, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 29, 2023 | Preliminary Conference Request | ||
December 06, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
December 06, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands |
||
December 06, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
December 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
November 22, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARION SCOTT REAL ESTATE INC / AFFIDAVIT |
||
November 06, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
October 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv |
||
October 11, 2023 |
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION (CPLR 306-C) (WITH PROOF OF SERVICE) *Corrected* Notice of Commencement of Action |
||
October 02, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Aff of Serv (Summit) |
||
October 02, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Aff of Serv (Rochdale) |
||
September 20, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint |