Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Akilandeswari Murugesh, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Licatesi, Anthony J., against Bolla Transport, Llc, Pierre J. Barthelemy, represented by Burns, Sean T, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Akilandeswari Murugesh, is suing the defendants, Pierre J. Barthelemy and Bolla Transport, LLC. The complaint alleges that on Jun...
DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 20, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 22, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 20, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 25, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 25, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Various Discovery |
||
October 20, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
October 20, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
September 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.