Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jun Lu, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Werlin, Jerald D., against Jie Wu, Zhihong Sun Wu, represented by Patterson, Jerome David, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a personal injury case arising from a motor vehicle accident that occurred on October 29, 2022. The plaintiff, Jun Lu, alleges that they were a pedestrian crossing Franklin Avenue at its intersection with Kissena Boulevard in Queens...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 15, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 15, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 09, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 07, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 09, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Affidavit of Exess of Insurance |
||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Police Report |
||
November 15, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands |
||
November 07, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 07, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Served on ZHIHON SUN WU |
||
October 09, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for EBT |
||
October 09, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 09, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for D & I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.