Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dennis Burns, Paulette M Burns, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Napoli, Marie, Schneider, Paul Bryan, against Ean Holdings Llc, Michael W Forstbauer, represented by Savino, Vincent Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Richard Latin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 25, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 14, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 18, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 17, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 25, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 18, 2020 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
November 18, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 18, 2020 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 17, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
November 02, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 02, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 14, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.