Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anatoliy Benyaminov, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gallet, Regis A., against Yulia Pinkhasov , A K A Julia Pinkhasov, represented by Davey, Brian R., Warsi, Syed Mohammed Ali, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Richard Latin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management42 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 05, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 05, 2020ANSWER
Date: October 21, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars and Discovery Demands
Date: October 21, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Hearing |
PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
January 14, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) PT 40 MOTIONS Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
November 25, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 24, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PART Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
November 09, 2020 | Motion |
PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (Motion #001) Before Justice: RICHARD LATIN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
November 05, 2020 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 05, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Color Scene Photograph |
||
November 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff Affidavit of Merit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.