Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Okyoung Chae, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kim, Soo Hyun, against Peter A Raccasi, represented by Karrmann-Granai, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Okyoung Chae, is suing the defendant, Peter A Raccasi, for negligence and recklessness in the operation of a motor vehicle. The c...
DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 05, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 05, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 26, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery dated 1/03/2024 |
||
January 05, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant's Response to Demands & PC Order |
||
January 05, 2024 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Defendant's Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses |
||
November 22, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 26, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Request for Preliminary Conference and Affirmation of Good Faith |
||
October 26, 2023 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
October 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 20, 2023 | Answer with Demands | ||
September 15, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.