Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Rosalee A. Smith, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Spektor, Gregory, against John Doe A Fictitious Name, True Name Unknown, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Department Of Transportation, New York City Transit Authority, The City Of New York, (total of 6) See All represented by Counsel, Corporation, Iskowitz, Lori B, Wetstone, Channon Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Kevin J Kerrigan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle - City |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Rosalee A. Smith, is suing the City of New York, New York City Department of Transportation, New York City Transit Authority, Met...
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 14, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 31, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 14, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 14, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 02, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 31, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 23, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.