Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Christopher Eduardo Farias, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Landa, Yolanda R, against Five Star Awning, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Richard Latin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time37 days |
PETITION
Date: September 30, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 30, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 08, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 05, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) PT 40 MOTIONS GTD Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
November 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
October 14, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
October 08, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
October 07, 2020 | Motion |
COMPEL COMPLIANCE (Motion #001) Decided: 11/05/2020CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: RICHARD LATIN Answer demanded: No Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
September 30, 2020 | PETITION | ||
September 30, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 30, 2020 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B ltr to Five Star Awning, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.