Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Marcel Mukhamedov, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Abrams, Melanie, against Dhaneshwar Balkaran, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Timothy J Dufficy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy J Dufficy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Marcel Mukhamedov, is suing the defendant, Dhaneshwar Balkaran, for negligence. The complaint alleges that on August 11, 2021, th...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION TO THE DEFENDANT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL RRR |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PLEADINGS |
||
January 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION FOR WORD COUNT CERTIFICATION |
||
January 18, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) GOOD FAITH LETTER |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
January 18, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 18, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 18, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
December 13, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DEFAULT LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.