Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rothschild Niyazov, Yakov Jack Shimonov, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Babaev, Eli, Bernard, Diane D, Shulman, Dmitriy, against 21St Century Snacks, Dylan Patrick Rupp, In-Store Distributors, Inc., represented by Cascone, Leonard Michael, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 05, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 26, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004) *Corrected*
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) DISCOVERY RESPONSES Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 30, 2021RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 30, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 25, 2022ADMISSION OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 25, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 25, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 24, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 14, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 20, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 24, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) S&C Index# 719690/2021 |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) elaw printout |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) D's Answer - Index# 719690/2021 |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) email from nycourts |
||
August 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005) Notice of Motion to Reargue |
||
August 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #005) Aff in Support of Mtn to Reargue |
||
July 19, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
May 20, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.