Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cheryl Sims, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gratt, Kevin Dana, against Carolyn G. Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 06, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 04, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 26, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 02, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 11, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 12, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 12, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 03, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 22, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
March 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 22, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR Supplemental Bill of Particulars Redacted |
||
March 03, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 03, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Good faith Letter |
||
January 06, 2022 | Bill of Particulars | ||
January 06, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery |
||
January 06, 2022 | Response to Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.