Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nyctl 2019-A Trust, The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Collateral Agent And Custodian For The Nyctl 2019-A Trust, The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Collateral Agent And Custodian For The Nyctl 2019-A Trust, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Akerman, Gershon, Montag, Jerry A., against Carrington Mortgage Services, Llc, George Brunswick, John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., New York City Department Of Finance, (total of 7) See All represented by Massimo, Kathleen M, Mirro, Michele, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 01, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 19, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 01, 2021CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: September 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance and Cancellation of Lis Pendens |
||
November 16, 2021 |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance and Cancellation of Lis Pendens |
||
November 10, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint |
||
October 19, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time To Respond To Complaint |
||
October 01, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
September 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant John Doe #1 |
||
September 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant New York City Environmental Control Board |
||
September 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant George Brunswick |
||
September 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant New York Department of Finance |
||
September 22, 2021 | Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.