Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Iveta Bannahyan, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Hamel, William R, Kleban, Alla, Liakas, Dean Nicholas, Liakas, Stephen John, against Rego Gardens Owners, Llc, represented by Suleymanov, Jessica L, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligence) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 23, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 17, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 15, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 29, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN
Date: April 27, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 10, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 24, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Second Supplemental Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
February 24, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 15, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
June 14, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
May 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN | ||
October 28, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 01, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.