Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ssa Ne Assets, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Buonincontri, Andrew M, Friedman Vartolo Llp, Nardolillo, Michael William, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against John Doe And Jane Doe, New York City Department Of Finance, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Paul Gross, R&C Asset Management Corp., (total of 5) See All represented by Heller, Alan Avery, Tordesillas, Bernard James, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip Hom Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note and Guaranty Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Notices of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 10, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 15, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 07, 2022NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001) Loan History Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Guaranty Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 23, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2022STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001) Defendants Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
October 07, 2022 |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation of Cancelation of Lis Pendens |
||
August 30, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Requesting to Withdraw MSJ Motion |
||
August 15, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Motion for Summary/Default Judgment and Appointment of a Referee to Compute - Re-Notice Letter |
||
August 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
June 29, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Motion for Summary/Default Judgment and Appointment of a Referee to Compute - Re-Notice Letter |
||
June 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
June 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Loan for Business Purpose Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR Loan for Business Purpose Affidavit Redacted |
||
June 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary/Default Judgment and Appointment of a referee to compute |
||
June 23, 2022 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.