Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Martha Mercedes Rodriguez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gambone, Adilya Rishatovna, against Bianey Areiza, New York City Department Of Transportation, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Rousseau, Marc Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other - City (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 26, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 14, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 12, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 14, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Letter for responses to plaintiff's combined demands dated 11.4.2021 |
||
April 26, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Discovery & Inspection |
||
April 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiff's Combined Demands |
||
March 14, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
November 19, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 12, 2021 |
ANSWER to Cross-Claims of City of New York |
||
September 23, 2021 | answer with combined demands | ||
July 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.