Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Geico General Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Guillermo Valencia And Daniel Galvis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Katechis, Chris, against Sheena Lawrence, represented by Liloia, Michael J., Ragone, Heather Cara, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 04, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 05, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 04, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) | ||
February 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A |
||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B |
||
November 04, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
October 05, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
July 13, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 15, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 15, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.