Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yuzhu Tian, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Louros, Steven, against Nuchem Hager, represented by Carola, Joseph, Puri, Aditi, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with CARMEN VELASQUEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARMEN VELASQUEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 13, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 20, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 20, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 05, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002) Supplemental Verified bill of particulars
Date: January 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in support of plaintiff's motion |
||
January 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of motion |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Supplemental Verified bill of particulars Supplemental Verified bill of particulars Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's EBT transcript |
||
January 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of service |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons and complaint; answer |
||
January 20, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #002) Statement of material facts |
||
January 20, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #002) Word count certification |
||
January 20, 2023 |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #002) Certificate pursuant to Court Rule 130-1.1(a) |
||
December 08, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.