Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, Jaganmohan R. Pasapula, John Doe, Mary Doe, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Maurice E. Muir presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaurice E. Muir Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 12, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 12, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: December 12, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Exhibits Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 12, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 19, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 19, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 EXHIBITS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 18, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: July 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | ||
December 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 12, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
December 12, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) | ||
December 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibits Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibits Redacted |
||
December 06, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) ORDER AMENDING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
October 19, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
October 19, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Proposed Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Proposed Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint Redacted |
||
October 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.