Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nakiyyah Cook, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bouganim, Alexander, against City Of New York, Jeremiah S Ranzie, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Kevin J Kerrigan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle - City |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2024ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 23, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 12, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO CASE SCHEDULING ORDER DATED JANUARY 17, 2024 |
||
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 12, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS |
||
December 12, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION CROSS-NOTICE OF EXAMINATION BEFORE TRIAL |
||
December 12, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR STATEMENTS, NAMES & ADDRESSES OF WITNESSES, PHOTOGRAPHS, INSURANCE INFORMATION, BUSINESS DEMAND FOR STATEMENTS, NAMES & ADDRESSES OF WITNESSES, PHOTOGRAPHS, INSURANCE INFORMATION, BUSINESS ... show more |
||
December 12, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR CONTENTS OF INSURANCE AGREEMENTS |
||
December 12, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 12, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 12, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS REGARDING THE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES RAISED IN DEFENDANTS' ANS DEMAND FOR VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS REGARDING THE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES RAISED IN DEFENDANTS' ANS ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.