Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sarah Paiz, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against New York City Housing Authority, The City Of New York, represented by Bass, Deborah A, Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Kevin J Kerrigan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence - City (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 18, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 22, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 24, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 19, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 18, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 18, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
July 24, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
July 19, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars-NYCHA |
||
July 19, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer-New York City Housing Authority |
||
July 19, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND NYCHA' s Automatic Insurance Response Pursuant to CPLR 3101 |
||
July 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
July 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.