Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Haimchand Mohabir, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Chirico, Vincent, Kahn, Mitchell R., Schiner, Curt Joseph, against Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Hvac Construction Inc., Rebco Associates, Rebco Associates, L.P., Tenber Associates, (total of 6) See All represented by Cariello, Denise A, Conklin, David Sheridan, Goldszer, Zena, John, Darrell, Temple, Alex M, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with DARRELL L. GAVRIN presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management458 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises -Labor) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 09, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 22, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 03, 2019SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: July 22, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 27, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 04, 2020ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: September 28, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 12, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 04, 2020BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 08, 2020THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 06, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 23, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 06, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 06, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 08, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: October 30, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: November 23, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 01, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 23, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 02, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: October 30, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 06, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2021SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 26, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 26, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Stipulation Adjourning Motion |
||
April 26, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
April 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service with Word Count |
||
March 28, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Stipulation Adjourning Plaintiff's Motion to Renew |
||
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Support |
||
March 09, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) Memorandum of Law in Support |
||
March 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Notice of Motion for Leave to Renew and for Summary Judgment |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Underlying Cross-Moving Papers |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Defendants' Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiff's Underlying Cross-Motion (with exhibit) |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Reply Papers in Further Support of his Underlying Cross-Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.