Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Vote Solar, For A Judgment Pursuant To Article 78 Of The Civil Practice Law And Rules v. New York City Department Of Correction
On May 30, 2024 a special proceedings - cplr article 78 case was filed by Vote Solar, For A Judgment Pursuant To Article 78 Of The Civil Practice Law And Rules, represented by Gittes, Susan Reagan, against New York City Department Of Correction, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge Timothy J. Dufficy presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 30, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 03, 2024
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Agency Action
Overview
As part of its advocacy efforts in support of the Renewable Rikers Plan, which aims to
repurpose Rikers Island for green infrastructure uses once the jail complex closes, Vote Solar has
submitted three Freedom of Information Law (“FOIL”) requests to the New York City
Department of Correction (“DOC”).
In particular, Vote Solar seeks disclosure of certain records relating to Rikers Island
housing units and environmental conditions.
The requested records are vital to effectuating the Renewable Rikers Plan and to realizing
the benefits that a green Rikers Island will offer to New Yorkers.
In violation of the clear requirements imposed on DOC by New York’s FOIL and despite
Vote Solar’s presumptive right to the requested records, DOC has consistently ignored its
statutory obligations, repeatedly failed to meet its self-imposed production deadlines, and failed
to provide an explanation for its delay or a date by which it will respond.
Causes of Action
1. ARTICLE 78 REVIEW OF WRONGFUL DENIAL OF FOIL REQUEST 2023FR0772
2. ARTICLE 78 REVIEW OF WRONGFUL DENIAL OF FOIL REQUEST 2024FR1017
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - L
Date: May 30, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - J
Date: May 30, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: May 30, 2024PETITION
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: May 30, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - K
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: May 30, 2024NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion 001)
Date: May 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: May 30, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C December 22, 2022 DOC Extension Notification |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H October 13, 2023 DOC Letter re Second Housing Units Request |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G October 6, 2023 FOIL Request re Second Housing Units Request |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L February 22, 2024 DOC Email transmitting Exhibit K |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION compel document production; Grant Attorney's Fees |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F July 31, 2023 DOC Appeal Response re Environmental Request |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J February 6, 2024 Vote Solar Appeal |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | |
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A October 24, 2022 DOC Letter re Housing Units Request |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
PETITION VERIFIED |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I December 8, 2023 DOC Letter re Second Housing Units Request |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF SUSAN GITTES |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K DOC Appeal Response re Second Housing Units Request |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E July 31, 2023 DOC Appeal Response re Housing Units Request |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D July 12, 2023 Vote Solar Appeal |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) | |
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B October 24, 2022 DOC Letter re Environmental Request |