We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Gary Wei Tan V. Rebecca Barzi

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Gary Wei Tan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Esagoff, Janet Nina, against Rebecca Barzi, represented by Sahni, Jaypreet Singh, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.

Case Details for Gary Wei Tan v. Rebecca Barzi

Judge

Cc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

May 03, 2023

Category

Commercial - Contract

Last Refreshed

January 30, 2024

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Queens County, NY

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Parties for Gary Wei Tan v. Rebecca Barzi

Plaintiffs

Gary Wei Tan

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Esagoff, Janet Nina

Defendants

Rebecca Barzi

Attorneys for Defendants

Sahni, Jaypreet Singh

Case Documents for Gary Wei Tan v. Rebecca Barzi

NOTICE OF MOTION

Date: January 28, 2024

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

Date: October 23, 2023

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Date: October 27, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - B

Date: October 27, 2023

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Date: October 27, 2023

DEMAND FOR:

Date: August 10, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - A

Date: October 27, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - C

Date: October 27, 2023

COMPLAINT *Corrected*

Date: May 03, 2023

SUMMONS

Date: May 03, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - A

Date: June 25, 2023

DEMAND FOR:

Date: August 09, 2023

PROOF OF SERVICE

Date: June 05, 2023

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

Date: June 26, 2023

Case Events for Gary Wei Tan v. Rebecca Barzi

Type Description
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Affirmation in Opposition (Sahni)
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Affidavit in Opposition (Barzi)
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002)
Holdover Petition (Landlord Tenant Court)
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Notice of Motion (Amended to Reflect 3/19/24 Return Date)
NOTICE OF MOTION
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Attorney Affirmation in Support (J. Sahni)
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001)
Exh A Letter Correspondence to Judge Doc 22 12.4.23
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Motion
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Notice of Motion to Compel Discovery
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Good Faith Letter_Discovery Demands
See all events