Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Stephanie Bolanos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paris, Jason L, against Haris Graca, Sadet Graca, represented by Kemp, Terence John, Vengerov, Alina, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 02, 2021ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 02, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 29, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 24, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-E Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 29, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 30, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 21, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 18, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
March 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 18, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 11, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Good-faith email dated January 6, 2022 |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Compliance Conference Order |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.